VA SB483 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary with letter (11-Y 3-N 1-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary with letter (11-Y 3-N 1-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Child abuse and neglect; limitations period on sexual abuse of a minor claims; background check and training requirements for youth sports coaches and staff. Eliminates the civil statute of limitations period for injury resulting from sexual abuse occurring during the infancy of the abused person and allows persons who have previously been time-barred from filing such an action due to the expiration of the limitations period in effect prior to July 1, 2022, to file such an action. The bill requires youth sports leagues to (i) require all coaches, staff members, employees, and other volunteers who will be alone with, in control of, or supervising children to complete a fingerprint-based background check; (ii) provide to all coaches, staff members, employees, and other volunteers who will be alone with, in control of, or supervising children and the parent of any child participating in the sports league written notice of the duty of all coaches, directors, and persons 18 years of age or older employed by or volunteering with the sports league to report suspected child abuse or neglect, information regarding how to report suspected child abuse or neglect, an explanation of the penalties that may be imposed for failure to file a required report, contact information for the local department of social services, and the telephone number for the Department of Social Services' toll-free child abuse and neglect hotline; and (iii) require all paid coaches, staff members, and employees who will be alone with, in control of, or supervising children to complete no less than four hours of training annually regarding child abuse prevention and response and require all volunteers who will be alone with, in control of, or supervising children to complete no less than two hours of training annually regarding child abuse prevention and response. The bill directs the Board of Education to promulgate regulations to implement the provisions of the bill and to develop and provide to sports leagues resources regarding child abuse prevention and response training opportunities. Child abuse and neglect; limitations period on sexual abuse of a minor claims; background check and training requirements for youth sports coaches and staff. Eliminates the civil statute of limitations period for injury resulting from sexual abuse occurring during the infancy of the abused person and allows persons who have previously been time-barred from filing such an action due to the expiration of the limitations period in effect prior to July 1, 2022, to file such an action. The bill requires youth sports leagues to (i) require all coaches, staff members, employees, and other volunteers who will be alone with, in control of, or supervising children to complete a fingerprint-based background check; (ii) provide to all coaches, staff members, employees, and other volunteers who will be alone with, in control of, or supervising children and the parent of any child participating in the sports league written notice of the duty of all coaches, directors, and persons 18 years of age or older employed by or volunteering with the sports league to report suspected child abuse or neglect, information regarding how to report suspected child abuse or neglect, an explanation of the penalties that may be imposed for failure to file a required report, contact information for the local department of social services, and the telephone number for the Department of Social Services' toll-free child abuse and neglect hotline; and (iii) require all paid coaches, staff members, and employees who will be alone with, in control of, or supervising children to complete no less than four hours of training annually regarding child abuse prevention and response and require all volunteers who will be alone with, in control of, or supervising children to complete no less than two hours of training annually regarding child abuse prevention and response. The bill directs the Board of Education to promulgate regulations to implement the provisions of the bill and to develop and provide to sports leagues resources regarding child abuse prevention and response training opportunities.
Title
Child abuse and neglect; limitations period on sexual abuse of a minor claims, background check.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary with letter (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary with letter (11-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed to LIS only 22106010D-S1 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104008D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 389 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 289.030 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 289.035 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 243 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |