VA SB478 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0629)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Clinch State Scenic River. Designates a 66.8-mile segment of the Clinch River in Tazewell and Russell Counties as part of the Clinch State Scenic River, a component of the Virginia Scenic Rivers System. The bill provides that nothing shall preclude the continued operation and maintenance of existing dams in the designated section of river. The bill contains a technical amendment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clinch River; designating segment in Tazewell County as part of the Clinch State Scenic River.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (83-Y 16-N) (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-02 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0629)
2020-04-02 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 629 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-10 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-10SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 10, 2020
2020-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-27SenateSigned by President
2020-02-27SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB478ER)
2020-02-27SenateEnrolled
2020-02-24HouseVOTE: Passage (83-Y 16-N)
2020-02-24HousePassed House (83-Y 16-N)
2020-02-24HouseRead third time
2020-02-21HouseRead second time
2020-02-19HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (18-Y 4-N)
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-02-03HouseRead first time
2020-02-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
2020-01-28SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB478S2
2020-01-28SenateSubstitute by Senator Chafin agreed to 20106769D-S2
2020-01-28SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-28SenateCommittee substitute rejected 20106281D-S1
2020-01-28SenateRead second time
2020-01-27SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-27SenateFloor substitute printed 20106769D-S2 (Chafin)
2020-01-24SenatePassed by for the day
2020-01-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21SenateSubstitute bill reprinted 20106281D-S1
2020-01-21SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106281D-S1
2020-01-21SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 2-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104971D

Same As/Similar To

HB5 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0306)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101408(n/a)See Bill Text
101410.2(n/a)See Bill Text
101411.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB478&201+sum+SB478
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB478+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB478S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB478S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB478ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0629+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S01V0017+SB0478
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0135SB0478+SB0478
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0221SB0478+SB0478
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H01V0225+SB0478
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1274+SB0478

Bill Comments

feedback