VA HB5 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0306)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Clinch State Scenic River. Designates a 66.8-mile segment of the Clinch River in Tazewell and Russell Counties as part of the Clinch State Scenic River, a component of the Virginia Scenic Rivers System. The bill provides that nothing shall preclude the continued operation and maintenance of existing dams in the designated section of river. The bill contains a technical amendment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clinch River; designating segment in Tazewell County as part of the Clinch State Scenic River.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 3-N) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 11-N) (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0306)
2020-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 306 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020
2020-03-05HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020
2020-02-27SenateSigned by President
2020-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB5ER)
2020-02-26HouseEnrolled
2020-02-21SenatePassed Senate (35-Y 3-N)
2020-02-21SenateRead third time
2020-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 2-N)
2020-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-28HouseVOTE: Passage (85-Y 11-N)
2020-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House (85-Y 11-N)
2020-01-27HouseEngrossed by House - floor substitute HB5H2
2020-01-27HouseSubstitute by Delegate Morefield agreed to 20106779D-H2
2020-01-27HouseCommittee substitute rejected 20106411D-H1
2020-01-27HouseRead second time
2020-01-27HouseFloor substitute printed 20106779D-H2 (Morefield)
2020-01-24HouseRead first time
2020-01-22HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106411D-H1
2020-01-22HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
2019-11-18HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-11-18HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100399D

Same As/Similar To

SB478 (Same As) 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0629)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101410.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB5&201+sum+HB5
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB5+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB5H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB5H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB5ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0306+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H01V0041+HB0005
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0116+HB0005
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S01V0081+HB0005
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0771HB0005+HB0005
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0816HB0005+HB0005

Bill Comments

feedback