VA SB474 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0260)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0260)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Temporary licenses and certificates. Authorizes the regulatory boards within the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation to issue a temporary license or certification to an applicant who holds a comparable license or certification issued by another state. A temporary license or certification shall be valid for not more than 45 days.
Title
Professional and Occupational Regulation, Department of; issuance of temporary licenses, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0260) | |
2010-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 260 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB474ER) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-04 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-03 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-02 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-23 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2010-02-18 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-02-18 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-18 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB474S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104783D-S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104783D-S1 | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102387D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 1 | 1052 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 759 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 921 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |