VA SB471 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - House: Tabled in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - House: Tabled in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Defective drywall; penalties. Makes it a prohibited practice under the Virginia Consumer Protection Act for a supplier to sell, offer for sale, or use in the construction, remodeling, or repair of any residential dwelling in Virginia, any drywall that he knows or has reason to know is drywall that, as a result of containing the same or greater levels of strontium sulfide that has been found in drywall manufactured in China and imported between 2004 and 2007, is capable of releasing sulfur compounds into the air. Such a sale, offering or use of drywall that has been designated by the Consumer Product Safety Commission as posing a substantial product hazard is also made a prohibited practice under the Virginia Consumer Protection Act. The legislation applies to transaction occurring on or after July 1, 2010.
Title
Defective drywall; penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | House: Tabled in Commerce and Labor by voice vote | |
2010-02-03 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10103328D-E | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB471E | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103328D |