VA SB449 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0563)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0563)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Newborn screening; lysosomal storage disorders. Directs the Board of Health to amend regulations governing newborn screening to include screening for Pompe disease and mucopolysaccharidosis type 1 (MPS-1). This bill is identical to HB 1174.
Title
Newborn screening; screening for Pompe disease, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0563) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 563 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB449ER) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-28 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2018-02-26 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18105876D-ES1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB449ES1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18105876D-S1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18105876D-S1 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104486D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 65 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 65.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 67 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |