VA SB440 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0372)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0372)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Credit unions and banks; mergers and consolidations. Establishes a procedure by which a state credit union may convert to a state mutual savings institution. Conversion requires approval of two-thirds of the eligible and voting members of the credit union, unless the articles of incorporation allow a greater or lesser vote (which shall in no event be less than a majority).
Title
Credit unions; conversion to a state mutual savings institution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0372) | |
2010-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 372 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB440ER) | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-02-26 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-25 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-23 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB440S1 | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105117D-S1 | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105117D-S1 | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103602D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
6 | 1 | 225.27:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 1 | 44.26 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |