VA SB44 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Kinship Guardianship Assistance program. Creates the Kinship Guardianship Assistance program (the program) to facilitate child placements with relatives and ensure permanency for children for whom adoption or being returned home are not appropriate permanency options. The bill sets forth eligibility criteria for the program, payment allowances to kinship guardians, and requirements for kinship guardianship assistance agreements. The bill also requires the Board of Social Services to promulgate regulations for the program. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kinship Guardianship Assistance program; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateFailed to pass
2018-03-10SenateNo further action taken
2018-03-08HousePassed by for the day
2018-03-07HousePassed by for the day
2018-03-06HousePassed by for the day
2018-03-05HousePassed by for the day
2018-03-02HousePassed by for the day
2018-03-01HousePassed by for the day
2018-02-28HousePassed by for the day
2018-02-27HousePassed by for the day
2018-02-26HousePassed by for the day
2018-02-23HouseRead second time
2018-02-21HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-08HouseRead first time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02SenatePrinted as engrossed 18100496D-E
2018-02-02SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB44E
2018-02-02SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-02-02SenateReading of amendments waived
2018-02-02SenateRead second time
2018-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-31SenateReported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-12SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-01-12SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 1-N)
2017-11-21SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2017-11-21SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100496D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
632100(n/a)See Bill Text
6321305(n/a)See Bill Text
632905(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback