VA SB434 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0192)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0192)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child support; assignment of tax credits. Provides that the court may assign a party in a child support proceeding the right to claim any credits resulting from the income tax dependency exemption for any child or children of the parties for federal and state income tax purposes.
Title
Child support; assignment of tax credits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0192) | |
2020-03-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 192 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 6, 2020 | |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 28, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB434ER) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-19 | House | VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100817D |