VA SB434 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Funeral protests; penalty. Makes it unlawful for a person to address speech to a person attending a funeral or memorial service that is reasonably likely to provoke an imminent breach of the peace, or to engage in picketing activity within 250 feet of a funeral or memorial service that targets one or more persons attending such service. A violation of this provision is a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Funeral or memorial service disruption; penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2012-02-27 | House | Continued to 2013 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2012-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2013 by voice vote |
2012-02-21 | House | Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal |
2012-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2012-02-17 | House | Referred from Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote |
2012-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2012-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2012-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB434S1 |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 12105264D-S1 |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Read second time |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 12105264D-S1 |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2012-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2012-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101277D |