VA SB433 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0260)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0260)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Delay proposed modifications to the discretionary sentencing guidelines; possession of child pornography. Provides that proposed modifications to the discretionary sentencing guidelines for possession of child pornography adopted by the Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission shall not become effective until July 1, 2016. The Commission will review these guidelines and complete its review by December 1, 2015. Any proposed modification in the Commission's 2015 Annual Report shall supersede the current proposed modifications.
Title
Child pornography; modifications to discretionary sentencing guidelines for possession.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0260) | |
2014-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 260 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB433ER) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2014-02-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-17 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 14103058D-E |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB433E |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103058D |
Same As/Similar To
HB504 (Same As) 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0100)