VA SB419 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Equal pay irrespective of sex. Amends the existing law requiring equal pay for equal work irrespective of sex to (i) prohibit unequal provision of benefits and privileges on the basis of sex; (ii) prohibit employers from punishing employees for sharing salary information with their coworkers; and (iii) authorize a court to award reasonable attorney fees and costs to an employee who substantially prevails on the merits in an action for wrongful withholding of wages or benefits and privileges. The measure also deletes the exemption for employers covered by the federal Fair Labor Standards Act from the Commonwealth's prohibition on discrimination in the payment of wages on the basis of sex.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discriminating between employees on the basis of sex; payment of wages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Finance (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30SenateLeft in Finance
2018-02-07SenateContinued to 2019 in Finance (11-Y 5-N)
2018-01-22SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-01-22SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-15SenateRereferred to Commerce and Labor
2018-01-15SenateRereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2018-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2018-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100949D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40128.6(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback