VA SB417 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0536)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0536)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authority of local boards of social services to employ in-house counsel. Authorizes local boards of social services to employ in-house counsel to provide general legal advice and representation related to specific actions.
Title
Social services, local boards of; authority to employ in-house counsel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0536) | |
2014-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 536 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB417ER) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Read third time |
2014-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101550D |
Same As/Similar To
HB264 (Same As) 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0122)