VA SB416 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0802)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0802)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; purchase of personal protective equipment. Requires a state agency, whenever purchasing personal protective equipment (PPE) for public use, to ensure such PPE comply with all applicable federal and international certifications. The bill provides that if a state agency receives three or more bids (i) from a Virginia-based company or manufacturer or a manufacturer that uses materials or components made in Virginia or the United States or (ii) from a United States-based manufacturer that uses materials or components made in the United States, the agency may only select among those bids. The bill also provides that if a state agency is unable to purchase PPE from such company or manufacturer, it may purchase from another company or manufacturer, pending the results of independent laboratory testing of the PPE. The bill directs the Secretary of Commerce and Trade to establish a work group to make recommendations to the General Assembly regarding products other than PPE that may be necessary if a state of emergency is declared in Virginia and that state agencies should purchase with the same requirements and to report the recommendations of the work group to the Chairs of the House Committee on General Laws and the Senate Committee on General Laws and Technology by September 1, 2022. Virginia Public Procurement Act; purchase of personal protective equipment. Requires a state agency, whenever purchasing personal protective equipment (PPE) for public use, to ensure such PPE comply with all applicable federal and international certifications. The bill provides that if a state agency receives three or more bids (i) from a Virginia-based company or manufacturer or a manufacturer that uses materials or components made in Virginia or the United States or (ii) from a United States-based manufacturer that uses materials or components made in the United States, the agency may only select among those bids. The bill also provides that if a state agency is unable to purchase PPE from such company or manufacturer, it may purchase from another company or manufacturer, pending the results of independent laboratory testing of the PPE. The bill directs the Secretary of Commerce and Trade to establish a work group to make recommendations to the General Assembly regarding products other than PPE that may be necessary if a state of emergency is declared in Virginia and that state agencies should purchase with the same requirements and to report the recommendations of the work group to the Chairs of the House Committee on General Laws and the Senate Committee on General Laws and Technology by September 1, 2022.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; purchase of personal protective equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 6-N) (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 6-N) (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0802) | |
2022-05-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 802 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 27, 2022 | |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Communicated to Governor on April 27, 2022 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB416ER) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Title replaced 22107385D-H1 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Passage (90-Y 6-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed House with substitute (90-Y 6-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB416H2 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 22107385D-H2 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee on General Laws substitute rejected 22107316D-H1 |
2022-03-09 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 22107385D-H2 |
2022-03-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 22107316D-H1 |
2022-03-01 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22100888D-E |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB416E |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 2-N) |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100888D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
State Agencies
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Virginia Public Procurement Act
State Agencies
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Virginia Public Procurement Act