VA SB41 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Council on the Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children; membership. Adds two nonlegislative citizen members to the Virginia Council on the Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children, one of whom is a parent of a military child, to be appointed by the Governor, and one of whom is a military spouse serving on the Department of Education's Military Student Support Process Action Team, to be appointed by the Superintendent of Public Instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children, Va. Council on; membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-10SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 10, 2020
2020-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-27SenateSigned by President
2020-02-27SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB41ER)
2020-02-27SenateEnrolled
2020-02-24HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24HouseRead third time
2020-02-21HouseRead second time
2020-02-19HouseReported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned Education sub: Pre-K-12
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB41S1
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108012D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108012D-S1
2020-02-07SenateIncorporates SB47 (Spruill)
2020-02-07SenateReported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2019-11-18SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-11-18SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100211D

Same As/Similar To

SB47 (Similar To) 2020-02-07 - Incorporated by Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221361(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB41&201+sum+SB41
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB41+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB41S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB41ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S10V0064+SB0041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB0041+SB0041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0520SB0041+SB0041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0521SB0041+SB0041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0522SB0041+SB0041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0523SB0041+SB0041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0901V0091+SB0041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H09V0226+SB0041
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1291+SB0041

Bill Comments

feedback