VA SB47 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Incorporated by Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Council on the Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children; membership. Increases the number of nonlegislative citizen members on the Virginia Council on the Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children from five members to six members and requires that a parent of a military child be included in the composition of the Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children, Va. Council on the; membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-07SenateIncorporated by Rules
2019-11-18SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-11-18SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100638D

Same As/Similar To

SB41 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221361(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback