VA SB409 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0352)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0352)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Duties of the clerk of the circuit court. Allows the court to order the immediate destruction, donation, or return of evidence where a defendant is found not guilty, and allows the clerk to do the same for cases concluded prior to July 1, 2005, without having to give specific notice, and requires the clerk to escheat all cash funds left over once forfeiture has concluded. The bill relieves the clerk of certifying local officers lists to the Secretary of the Commonwealth, by imposing that requirement on the locality itself. The bill requires that the clerk may reject any writing for recordation that is not specifically required by law to be recorded. The bill also repeals several small monetary forfeitures imposed on the clerk for failure to (i) record certificates of satisfaction as required, and (ii) perform any duty generally. The bill also reduces from $100 to $50 a monetary forfeiture imposed on the clerk for failure to provide the Department of Corrections with copies of orders.
Title
Circuit court; duties of clerk.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0352) | |
2010-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 352 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB409ER) | |
2010-03-22 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-12 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-12 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-11 | House: Delegates: Janis, Kilgore, Herring | |
2010-03-11 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Senators: Vogel, Deeds, Puckett | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-11 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2010-03-11 | House: House insisted on substitute | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB409H1 | |
2010-03-09 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105963D-H1 | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Constitutional reading dispensed BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Motion to reconsider constitutional reading dispensed agreed to | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: --- AGREE TO (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Constitutional reading dispensed BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-08 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105963D-H1 | |
2010-03-08 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #4 Judicial Systems | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10104998D-ES1 | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB409ES1 | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Amendments by Senator Edwards agreed to | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104998D-S1 | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104998D-S1 | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100685D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 218 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 229 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 270.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |