VA SB406 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1257)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Environmental justice; policy. Provides that it is the policy of the Commonwealth to promote environmental justice, defined in the bill, and to ensure that it is carried out throughout the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental justice; definitions, agency regulations, Virginia Environmental Justice Act, policy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (49-Y 43-N) (Y: 49 N: 42 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 43-N) (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1257)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1257 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled bill text (SB406ER2)
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (49-Y 43-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (49-Y 43-N)
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (22-Y 18-N)
2020-04-08SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-03SenateSigned by President
2020-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-02SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB406ER)
2020-03-02SenateEnrolled
2020-02-25SenateTitle replaced 20108618D-H1
2020-02-25SenateHouse substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N)
2020-02-21HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 43-N)
2020-02-21HousePassed House with substitute with amendment (54-Y 43-N)
2020-02-21HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment SB406H1
2020-02-21HouseAmendment by Delegate Keam agreed to
2020-02-21HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108618D-H1
2020-02-21HouseRead third time
2020-02-20HouseRead second time
2020-02-18HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108618D-H1
2020-02-18HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (12-Y 9-N)
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N)
2020-02-03SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB406S1
2020-02-03SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107107D-S1
2020-02-03SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-03SenateRead second time
2020-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107107D-S1
2020-01-29SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 1-N 1-A)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103457D

Same As/Similar To

HB704 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1212)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
225515(n/a)See Bill Text
225516(n/a)See Bill Text
225517(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB406&201+sum+SB406
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB406+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB406S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB406H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB406ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB406ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1257+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S12V0098+SB0406
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0257SB0406+SB0406
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0311SB0406+SB0406
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H11V0391+SB0406
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1167+SB0406
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0949SB0406+SB0406
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1974SB0406+SB0406
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2274+SB0406

Bill Comments

feedback