VA HB704 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1212)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Environmental justice; policy. Provides that it is the policy of the Commonwealth to promote environmental justice, defined in the bill, and to ensure that it is carried out throughout the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental justice; definitions, agency regulations, Virginia Environmental Justice Act, policy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (52-Y 43-N) (Y: 52 N: 43 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 42-N) (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (60-Y 40-N) (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1212)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1212 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled bill text (HB704ER2)
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (23-Y 17-N)
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: Agree To (52-Y 43-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (52-Y 43-N)
2020-04-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-04-08HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-03SenateSigned by President
2020-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-02HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB704ER)
2020-03-02HouseEnrolled
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Adoption (54-Y 42-N)
2020-02-26HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 20108214D-S1 (54-Y 42-N)
2020-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-24SenatePassed Senate with substitute (25-Y 14-N)
2020-02-24SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB704S1
2020-02-24SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108214D-S1
2020-02-24SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-24SenateRead third time
2020-02-21SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108214D-S1
2020-02-18SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 5-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (60-Y 40-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (60-Y 40-N)
2020-02-10HousePrinted as engrossed 20106928D-EH1
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB704EH1
2020-02-10HouseCommittee on Appropriations amendments agreed to
2020-02-10HouseCommittee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources substitute agreed to 20106928D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseReported from Appropriations with amendments (17-Y 5-N)
2020-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2020-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106928D-H1
2020-02-05HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103275D

Same As/Similar To

SB406 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1257)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22234(n/a)See Bill Text
22235(n/a)See Bill Text
22236(n/a)See Bill Text
222699.13(n/a)See Bill Text
222699.8(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB704&201+sum+HB704
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB704+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB704H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB704EH1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB704S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB704ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB704ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1212+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0103V0022+HB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H01V0163+HB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0201V0034+HB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0216+HB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0259+HB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0859+HB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S01V0101+HB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0771HB0704+HB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0895HB0704+HB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1449+HB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2018HB0704+HB0704
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2289+HB0704

Bill Comments

feedback