VA SB403 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Energy Storage Consortium. Establishes the Virginia Energy Storage Consortium as a political subdivision of the Commonwealth for the purpose of positioning the Commonwealth as a leader in research, development, commercialization, manufacturing, and deployment of energy storage technology. The powers of the Consortium include (i) promoting collaborative efforts among Virginia's public and private institutions of higher education in research, development, and commercialization efforts related to energy storage; (ii) monitoring relevant developments nationally and globally; and (iii) identifying and working with the Commonwealth's industries and nonprofit partners. The Consortium shall be governed by a board of directors of 15 nonlegislative citizen members appointed by the Governor, who shall initially serve staggered terms. Staff support shall be provided by the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy. The measure expires on July 1, 2021.
Title
Virginia Energy Storage Consortium: created, terms of Board members, report.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2017 in Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-02 | Senate | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Continued to 2017 in Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103876D |