VA SB403 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0104)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0104)
Summary
Ethics and fairness in carrier business practices; payment of claims for pharmacy benefits. Requires contracts between a health insurance carrier and its administrator of pharmacy benefits to make payments electronically to the participating provider or its designee if the contract with the provider requires claims to be submitted electronically. The measure applies to contracts entered into, amended, extended or renewed on or after January 1, 2009.
Title
Pharmacy benefits; claims and payments submitted electronically.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0104) | |
2008-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 104 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-20 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB403ER) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-19 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-18 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-14 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB403S1 | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 080158300-S1 | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080158300-S1 | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086944300 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB403 |