VA SB40 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Line of Duty Act; eligible dependents. Provides that children born or adopted after the death or disability of an employee covered by the Line of Duty Act are eligible for health insurance coverage if their birth or adoption occurred after the time of the employee's death or disability, but prior to July 1, 2017. Under current law, such children are not eligible unless they were adopted pursuant to a preadoptive agreement entered into prior to the death or disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Line of Duty Act; eligible dependents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-17SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020
2020-03-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by President
2020-03-12SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB40ER)
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled
2020-03-05SenateTitle replaced 20109043D-H1
2020-03-05SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05SenatePassed by temporarily
2020-03-04HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2020-03-04HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2020-03-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB40H1
2020-03-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20109043D-H1
2020-03-04HouseRead third time
2020-03-03HouseRead second time
2020-02-28HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 20109043D-H1
2020-02-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-13HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-31SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB40S1
2020-01-30SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106759D-S1
2020-01-30SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-30SenateRead second time
2020-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106759D-S1
2020-01-28SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Finance to Finance and Appropriations due to a change of the committee name
2019-11-18SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2019-11-18SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100676D

Same As/Similar To

HB51 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 207 (effective 7/1/20)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91400(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB40&201+sum+SB40
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB40+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB40S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB40H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB40ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0062+SB0040
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0232SB0040+SB0040
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0249SB0040+SB0040
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0202V0055+SB0040
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0426+SB0040
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0466+SB0040
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0506+SB0040
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1858+SB0040
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1570SB0040+SB0040

Bill Comments

feedback