VA HB51 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0207)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0207)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Line of Duty Act; eligible dependents. Provides that children born or adopted after the death or disability of an employee covered by the Line of Duty Act are eligible for health insurance coverage if their birth or adoption occurred after the time of the employee's death or disability, but prior to July 1, 2017. Under current law, such children are not eligible unless they were adopted pursuant to a preadoptive agreement entered into prior to the death or disability.
Title
Line of Duty Act; eligible dependents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0207) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 207 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020 | |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB51ER) |
2020-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-04 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB51H1 |
2020-02-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106850D-H1 |
2020-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106850D-H1 |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2020-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-24 | House | Reported from Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned PS sub: Public Safety |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2019-11-25 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101307D |
Same As/Similar To
SB40 (Same As) 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0559)