VA SB395 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Commission on the Centennial of Woodrow Wilson's Presidency. Amends the third enactment of Chapter 667 of the Acts of Assembly of 2010 to extend the Commission contingent upon the receipt of private funding by July 1, 2013. In the event the Commission is not funded by private funds, it will expire on July 1, 2013. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Commission on the Centennial of Woodrow Wilson's Presidency.
Title
Woodrow Wilson's Presidency, Virginia Commission on the Centennial of; extends date for funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 571 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB395ER) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-23 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-21 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB395S1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105378D-S1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105378D-S1 | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101496D |