VA SB394 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0258)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0258)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local cigarette tax stamps. Requires that beginning January 1, 2013, any local tax stamp or meter impression required to be used to evidence payment of the local cigarette tax shall be of the same stamp technology that is used or required by the Commonwealth for the state cigarette tax stamp.
Title
Cigarette tax stamps, local; same technology used or required by State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0258) | |
2012-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 258 (effective 1/1/13) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-27 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB394ER) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-22 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-20 | House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100724D |
Same As/Similar To
HB277 (Same As) 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)