VA SB392 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0568)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0568)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Involuntary commitment of a juvenile; notification of parents. Permits the court to proceed with a hearing for the involuntary commitment of a juvenile in instances where both parents cannot be notified if the court determines that copies of the petition for involuntary commitment and notice of the hearing have been served on at least one parent and a reasonable effort has been made to serve such copies on both parents.
Title
Involuntary commitment of a juvenile; notification of parents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0568) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 568 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB392ER) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Title replaced 18107524D-H1 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB392H1 |
2018-03-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18107524D-H1 |
2018-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-06 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 18107524D-H1 |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB392S1 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106434D-S1 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106434D-S1 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103640D |