VA SB39 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; form of ballot; party identification of candidates on ballots; constitutional officers. Extends to elections for constitutional officers the requirement that ballots identify the nominating political party for party candidates and identify independent candidates as such. Currently, this requirement applies only to federal, statewide, and General Assembly elections.
Title
Constitutional officers; form of ballot, party identification of candidates on ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2022-03-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 2-N) |
2021-12-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-12-27 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100384D |