VA SB389 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1114)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1114)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; license and fee reform. Reorganizes all alcoholic beverage control licenses pursuant to the three-tier structure and license privileges, consolidates many licenses with common privileges, aligns license fee amounts with enforcement demands, and standardizes quantity limits on alcohol samples. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2021.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; definitions, license and fee reform.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 9-N) (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (91-Y 9-N) (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1114) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1114 (effective - see bill) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB389ER) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Title replaced 20108236D-H1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | VOTE: Passage (91-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Passed House with substitute (91-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB389H1 |
2020-02-18 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108236D-H1 |
2020-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-13 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108236D-H1 |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB389S1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20105539D-S1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20105539D-S1 |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Incorporates SB447 (Reeves) |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101743D |
Same As/Similar To
SB447 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Incorporated by Rehabilitation and Social Services
HB390 (Same As) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1113)
HB390 (Same As) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1113)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2288.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2288.3:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2288.3:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 912.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 5115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 103.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 119 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 124 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 132 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 201.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 206.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 206.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 206.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 207.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 209.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 212.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 216 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 221.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 223 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 225.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 227 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 231 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 231.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 232 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 233 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 233.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 238 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 310.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 325.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 325.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 327 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 339.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 609.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |