VA SB388 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - House: Continued to 2013 in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - House: Continued to 2013 in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plates; IN REMEMBRANCE, APRIL 16, 2007. Authorizes the issuance of revenue-sharing special license plates bearing the legend IN REMEMBRANCE, APRIL 16, 2007. The annual surcharge for these plates would be $25 instead of the standard $10 for most other nonrevenue-sharing special license plates. For each set of plates issued (after the first 1,000 sets) $15 will go to the VTV Family Outreach Foundation, to support its operation and programs in Virginia.
Title
License plates, special; issuance of those bearing legend: IN REMEMBRANCE, APRIL 16, 2007.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | House: Continued to 2013 in Transportation by voice vote | |
2012-02-21 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2013 by voice vote | |
2012-02-17 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #3 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103868D |