VA SB382 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB382
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Continued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Continued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; coverage for prosthetic devices. Requires health insurers, corporations providing health care coverage subscription contracts, health maintenance organizations, and the Commonwealth's Medicaid program to provide coverage for prosthetic devices, including myoelectric, biomechanical, or microprocessor-controlled prosthetic devices that have a Medicare code. The measure repeals the existing requirement that coverage for prosthetic devices be offered and made available. The measure has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2021.
Title
Health insurance; coverage for prosthetic devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 10-N) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 10-N) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Continued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 10-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103565D |
Same As/Similar To
SB382 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Continued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3418.15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3418.15:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |