VA SB382 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB382

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance; coverage for prosthetic devices. Requires health insurers, corporations providing health care coverage subscription contracts, health maintenance organizations, and the Commonwealth's Medicaid program to provide coverage for prosthetic devices, including myoelectric, biomechanical, or microprocessor-controlled prosthetic devices that have a Medicare code. The measure repeals the existing requirement that coverage for prosthetic devices be offered and made available. The measure has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance; coverage for prosthetic devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 10-N) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04HouseLeft in Labor and Commerce
2020-02-20HouseContinued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2020-02-18HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-02-14HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-07SenatePassed Senate (29-Y 10-N)
2020-02-07SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07SenateRead third time and passed Senate (28-Y 10-N)
2020-02-06SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-20SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-20SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 2-N)
2020-01-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2020-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103565D

Same As/Similar To

SB382 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Continued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321325(n/a)See Bill Text
3823418.15(n/a)See Bill Text
3823418.15:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback