VA SB382 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0167)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; delivery of wine or beer to retail licensee; wholesaler requirement. Requires that before any wine or beer may be delivered to a retail licensee for resale, such wine or beer first be delivered to the licensed premises of a wine or beer wholesaler, unloaded from the transporting vehicle, kept on the licensed premises of the wholesaler for not less than four hours prior to reloading on a vehicle, and recorded in the wholesaler's inventory. The bill exempts any holder of a restricted wholesale wine license issued pursuant to ?§4.1-207.1 from the requirement to keep the wine or beer on the licensed premises of the wholesaler for not less than four hours prior to reloading on a vehicle. This bill is identical to HB 820.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; delivery of wine or beer to retail licensee, wholesaler requirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0167)
2018-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 167 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
2018-02-26SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
2018-02-23SenateSigned by President
2018-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB382ER)
2018-02-22SenateEnrolled
2018-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20HouseRead third time
2018-02-19HouseRead second time
2018-02-15HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-23HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-01-23HouseRead first time
2018-01-23HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-17SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-17SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB382S1
2018-01-17SenateSubstitute by Senator Chafin agreed to 18105337D-S1
2018-01-17SenateFloor substitute printed 18105337D-S1 (Chafin)
2018-01-17SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-01-17SenateEngrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-17SenatePassed by temporarily
2018-01-16SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-12SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2018-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101341D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41310.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB382
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB382+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB382S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB382ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0167+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S09V0018+SB0382
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0020SB0382+SB0382
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0045SB0382+SB0382
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0046SB0382+SB0382
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0047SB0382+SB0382
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H11V0215+SB0382
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0843+SB0382

Bill Comments

feedback