VA SB371 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Judicial authorization of treatment; advance directives. Provides that a court may authorize medical treatment for an incapacitated person when there is no available person with legal authority to make such decisions under (i) the advance directive of the incapacitated person; (ii) the regulations promulgated by the State Board of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; or (iii) other applicable law. The court may not authorize treatment that is contrary to the provisions of an advance directive or is proven by a preponderance of the evidence to be contrary to the incapacitated person's religious beliefs, basic values, or specific preferences as stated by the person before becoming incapable of making an informed decision, unless the treatment is necessary to prevent death or a serious irreversible condition. The bill also authorizes restraint or transportation of an incapacitated person if necessary for treating a mental disorder of a person subject to an order of involuntary admission.
Title
Judicial authorization of treatment; advance directives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115) | |
2012-03-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 115 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB371ER) | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-20 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2012-02-20 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-17 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-15 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB371S1 | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104346D-S1 | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104346D-S1 | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103380D |
Same As/Similar To
HB638 (Same As) 2012-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0378)
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, Department of
Judges, Justices, and Other Elective Officers
Judges, Justices, and Other Elective Officers