VA SB368 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0386)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0386)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; standards of accreditation. Authorizes the Board of Education to review once every two years or once every three years the accreditation status of any school that is not on a triennial review cycle as a result of three consecutive years of full accreditation, provided that any school that receives a multiyear accreditation status other than full accreditation to be covered by a Board-approved multiyear corrective action plan for the duration of the period of accreditation. The bill also provides that when the Board of Education determines that a corrective action plan submitted by a local school board is not sufficient to enable all schools within the division to achieve full accreditation, the Board may return the plan to the local school board with directions to submit an amended plan pursuant to Board guidance. Finally, the bill requires the Superintendent of Public Instruction to report to the Board on the accreditation status of all school divisions and schools. Currently the Superintendent is required to identify to the Board schools or divisions that do not meet certain criteria.
Title
Public schools; standards for accreditation, corrective action plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0386) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 386 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB368ER) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Title replaced 16105791D-H1 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB368H1 |
2016-02-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105791D-H1 |
2016-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105791D-H1 |
2016-02-24 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Innovation |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 16102188D-E |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB368E |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102188D |