VA SB368 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0811)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0811)
Summary
Disregarding signal to stop; death of law-enforcement officer; penalties. Provides that if a law-enforcement officer pursues a person who has disregarded a law-enforcement officer's signal to stop his motor vehicle and drives in willful and wanton disregard of such signal so as to interfere with or endanger the operation of the law-enforcement vehicle or to endanger people and the law-enforcement officer is killed as a direct and proximate result of the pursuit, the person is guilty of a Class 4 felony. The bill also increases the penalty for disregarding a signal from a law-enforcement officer to stop or attempting to escape or elude a law-enforcement officer from a Class 3 misdemeanor to a Class 2 misdemeanor. This bill is identical to
Title
Disregarding signal to stop; endangerment of operation of law-enforcement officer, penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0811) | |
2008-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 811 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-26 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-24 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB368ER) | |
2008-03-24 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-07 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-07 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-07 | Senate: Reading of conference report waived | |
2008-03-06 | House: Delegates: Ware, R.L., Cline, Valentine | |
2008-03-06 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senators: Puckett, Watkins, Ticer | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-06 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2008-03-06 | House: House insisted on substitute | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 36-N) | |
2008-03-06 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Passed House with substitute (94-Y 5-N) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB368H1 | |
2008-03-06 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 080902348-H1 | |
2008-03-06 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2008-03-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 080902348-H1 | |
2008-02-29 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-19 | House: Referred from Transportation by voice vote | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 080837348-ES1 | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB368ES1 | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 080837348-S1 | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-24 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080837348-S1 | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-17 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Rereferred to Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084500348 |
Same As/Similar To
HB113 (Same As) 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0773)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB368 |