VA SB365 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0005)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0005)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Regulated land-disturbing activities; submission and approval of erosion and sediment control plan. Prohibits a person from engaging in any land-disturbing activity until, where Virginia Pollutant Discharge Elimination System (VPDES) permit coverage is required, the Virginia Erosion and Sediment Control Program (VESCP) authority has obtained evidence of such permit coverage from the Department of Environmental Quality's online reporting system prior to issuing its land-disturbance approval. Current law requires the VESCP authority to obtain such evidence of VPDES permit coverage prior to approving an erosion and sediment control plan.
Title
Regulated land-disturbing activities; submission and approval of erosion and sediment control plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0005) | |
2024-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 5 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2024 |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB365ER) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-19 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102266D |
Same As/Similar To
HB656 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0104)