VA SB360 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0820)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0820)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Installation of certain facilities by developer; reimbursement. Authorizes a locality that has adopted an ordinance for payment by a subdivider or developer of land of the pro rata share of the cost of providing reasonable and necessary sewerage, water, and drainage facilities to also provide in its subdivision ordinance that, when adequate water, sewerage, or drainage facilities are not available to serve a proposed subdivision or development, the subdivider or developer of the property may be permitted to install reasonable and necessary water, sewerage, and drainage facilities, located on or outside the property limits of the land owned or controlled by the subdivider or developer but necessitated or required, at least in part, by the utility needs of the development or subdivision, including reasonably anticipated capacity, extensions, or maintenance considerations of a utility service plan for the service area and provides certain requirements for reimbursement of such installation.
Title
Water, sewerage, and drainage; standards for installation by developer, policies for reimbursement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (83-Y 16-N) (Y: 83 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (83-Y 16-N) (Y: 83 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0820) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 820 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB360ER) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Title replaced 20108407D-H1 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (83-Y 16-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House with substitute (83-Y 16-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB360H1 |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108407D-H1 |
2020-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108407D-H1 |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB360S1 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106122D-S1 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106122D-S1 |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102768D |