VA SB36 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0535)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Weekend jail time. Allows courts, for good cause and absent objection by the Commonwealth, to impose nonconsecutive or weekend jail time for defendants convicted of a misdemeanor, a traffic offense, any offense under Chapter 5 (?§20-61 et seq.) of Title 20, or a felony that is not an act of violence as defined in ?§19.2-297.1, provided that the active portion of the sentence remaining to be served is 45 days or less. Under current law, the imposition of nonconsecutive or weekend jail time is limited to defendants convicted of a misdemeanor, a traffic offense, or any offense under Chapter 5 (?§20-61 et seq.) of Title 20.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Weekend jail time; replaces provision limiting nonconsecutive days.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0535)
2018-03-29 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 535 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
2018-03-12SenateSigned by President
2018-03-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-10SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB36ER)
2018-03-10SenateEnrolled
2018-03-08SenateTitle replaced 18107746D-H1
2018-03-08SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB36H1
2018-03-07HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18107746D-H1
2018-03-07HouseRead third time
2018-03-06HouseRead second time
2018-03-02HouseCommittee substitute printed 18107746D-H1
2018-03-02HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-23HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-23HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-01-23HouseRead first time
2018-01-23HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-17SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2018-01-16SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-01-12SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 2-N)
2017-11-20SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2017-11-20SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100250D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531131.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB36
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB36+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB36H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB36ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0535+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S09V0008+SB0036
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0020SB0036+SB0036
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0048SB0036+SB0036
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0801V0194+SB0036
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H08V0600+SB0036
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1409+SB0036
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1067SB0036+SB0036

Bill Comments

feedback