VA SB356 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0624)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0624)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Titling manufactured homes. Revises requirements and procedures for titling manufactured homes.
Title
Manufactured homes; revises requirements, etc., for titling homes, conversion to real property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0624) | |
2014-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 624 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB356ER) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-05 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2014-03-04 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2014-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB356S1 |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104002D-S1 |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104002D-S1 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101888D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 632 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 653 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 653.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |