VA SB355 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0255)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0255)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local taxation of short-term rental property. Classifies short-term rental property as a separate classification of merchants' capital, and would authorize the governing body of any locality to tax short-term rental property under the merchants' capital tax or under the short-term rental property tax, but not both. The bill also declares that short-term rental property does not constitute tangible personal property for purposes of local taxation. The bill is effective for tax years beginning on and after January 1, 2010.
Title
Short-term rental property; shall classify as a separate classification of merchants' capital.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0255) | |
2010-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 255 (effective 1/1/10) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB355ER) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-03 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-02 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-01 | House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #1 | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB355S1 | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105019D-S1 | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105019D-S1 | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103844D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3510.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3510.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |