VA SB353 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal history record checks; barrier crimes. Sets out the list of barrier crimes for (i) individuals seeking employment at nursing homes, home care organizations, hospices, state facilities, and private providers licensed by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, community services boards, behavioral health authorities, assisted living facilities, adult day care centers, children's welfare agencies, family day homes approved by family day systems, and children's residential facilities; (ii) applicants for licensure, registration, or approval as assisted living facilities, child welfare agencies, or family day homes approved by family day systems; (iii) individuals with whom a local board of social services or child-placing agency is considering placing a child on an emergency, temporary, or permanent basis; (iv) foster and adoptive homes seeking approval from child-placing agencies; and (v) providers of adult services and adult foster care seeking approval by the Department of Social Services by setting out each of the crimes included in the definition of "barrier crime." The bill also makes technical changes and updates obsolete language.
Title
Criminal history record checks; sets out list of barrier crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (11-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (11-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2014-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB353S1 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14104405D-S1 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (11-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14104405D-S1 |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103377D |
Subjects
Civil Remedies and Procedure
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Criminal Procedure
Health
Welfare (Social Services)
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Criminal Procedure
Health
Welfare (Social Services)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 914 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 389 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 296.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 126.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 162.9:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 314 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 408.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1601.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1717 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1719 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1720 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1726 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 901.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |