VA SB35 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Sentence reduction; substantial assistance to prosecution. Allows a convicted person's sentence to be reduced if such person provides substantial assistance, defined in the bill, in the furtherance of the investigation or prosecution of another person engaged in an act of violence or for offenses involving the manufacture or distribution of controlled substances or marijuana. Sentence reduction can occur only upon motion of the attorney for the Commonwealth. This bill is identical to HB 188.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentence reduction; substantial assistance to prosecution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493)
2018-03-29 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 493 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
2018-03-12SenateSigned by President
2018-03-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-10SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB35ER)
2018-03-10SenateEnrolled
2018-03-08SenateTitle replaced 18107641D-H1
2018-03-08SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2018-03-08SenateReconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2018-03-08SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
2018-03-07HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB35H1
2018-03-07HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18107641D-H1
2018-03-07HouseRead third time
2018-03-06HouseRead second time
2018-03-02HouseCommittee substitute printed 18107641D-H1
2018-03-02HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2018-02-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-23HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-05HouseRead first time
2018-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-30SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29SenatePrinted as engrossed 18100459D-E
2018-01-29SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB35E
2018-01-29SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-01-29SenateReading of amendments waived
2018-01-29SenateRead second time
2018-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2018-01-24SenateReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2017-11-20SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-11-20SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100459D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192303.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+SB35
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB35+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB35E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB35H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+SB35ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0493+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S03V0186+SB0035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0162SB0035+SB0035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0206SB0035+SB0035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0801V0190+SB0035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H08V0599+SB0035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1408+SB0035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1066SB0035+SB0035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1085SB0035+SB0035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1086SB0035+SB0035

Bill Comments

feedback