VA SB347 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Center for Rural Virginia; expansion and promotion of agricultural opportunities. Provides the Center for Rural Virginia with the additional authority to facilitate the development of incentives and to provide a forum for competing interests to allow for job creation and expanded economic opportunities for farm businesses and rural enterprises while ensuring the rights of localities to develop reasonable regulations of such farm businesses and rural enterprises to protect the health, safety and welfare of residents. The Center will also convene a task force comprised of the Deputy Secretary for Rural Economic Development, and representatives of local government and agricultural interests to examine and make recommendations on issues related to the expansion and promotion of farm businesses or rural enterprises over the upcoming year.
Title
Center for Rural Virginia; expansion and promotion of agricultural opportunities, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 797 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB347ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 1-N) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-20 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-10 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB347ER) | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2010-02-26 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-26 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-25 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-24 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB347S1 | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104784D-S1 | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104784D-S1 | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103722D |
Same As/Similar To
HB582 (Same As) 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0833)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3851 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |