VA SB342 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - House: VOTE: --- DEFEATED (42-Y 56-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - House: VOTE: --- DEFEATED (42-Y 56-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Transient occupancy tax. Provides that any county may levy the transient occupancy tax on single-family residences and time-shares rented out fewer than 30 consecutive days.
Title
Transient occupancy tax; any county may levy tax on single-family residences.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: --- DEFEATED (42-Y 56-N) (Y: 43 N: 57 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | House: VOTE: --- DEFEATED (42-Y 56-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Defeated by House (42-Y 56-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-03-03 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-02 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-01 | House: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 9-N) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #1 | |
2010-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10101409D-E | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB342E | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Amendment by Senator Norment agreed to | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Committee amendment #2 rejected | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Committee amendment #1 agreed to | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101409D |