VA SB340 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB340
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-21 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-21 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Freestanding emergency departments. Requires the Board of Health to promulgate regulations related to freestanding emergency departments, defined in the bill as facilities located in the Commonwealth that (i) provide emergency services, (ii) are owned and operated by a licensed hospital and operate under the hospital's license, and (iii) are located on separate premises from the primary campus of the hospital. The bill also requires freestanding emergency departments to make certain disclosures to patients, in advertisements, and on any online platforms associated with such emergency department.
Title
Freestanding emergency departments; Bd. of Health to promulgate regulations related to departments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2023 in Education and Health (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-21 | Senate | Left in Education and Health |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Continued to 2023 in Education and Health (11-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101751D |
Same As/Similar To
SB340 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Continued to 2023 in Education and Health (11-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 123 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 125 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 125.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 127 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |