VA SB340 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
The Virginia Water Quality Improvement Fund; publicly owned treatment works; nutrient reduction. Authorizes the Director of the Department of Environmental Quality (the Department) to issue grants from the Virginia Water Quality Improvement Fund for water quality improvements, including cost effective technologies to reduce loads of total phosphorus, total nitrogen, or nitrogen-containing ammonia, in order to meet certain requirements of ammonia-related regulations that are more stringent than those adopted by the State Water Control Board (the Board). The bill also requires the Department to prepare a preliminary estimate of the amount and timing of Water Quality Improvement Grants required to fund projects to reduce loads of nitrogen-containing ammonia at certain levels based on an estimate of the anticipated range of costs for all publicly owned treatment works if the Board were to adopt the 2013 Aquatic Life Ambient Water Quality Criteria for Ammonia published by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. This bill is identical to HB 1608.
Title
Virginia Water Quality Improvement Fund; publicly owned treatment works, nutrient reduction.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Peake [R] | Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 610 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB340ER) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-28 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18103170D-E |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB340E |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103170D |