VA SB320 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1254)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Community Flood Preparedness Fund; loan and grant program. Continues the Virginia Shoreline Resiliency Fund as the Virginia Community Flood Preparedness Fund, providing that the Fund shall include all sums that are deposited from revenue generated by the sale of emissions allowances and are designated to assist localities affected by recurrent flooding, sea level rise, and flooding from severe weather events. The bill directs the Virginia Resources Authority to manage the Fund and the Department of Conservation and Recreation to administer the Fund. The measure authorizes the Authority to manage the Fund in accordance with a memorandum of agreement with the Department and to pledge the assets of the Fund as security for any bonds issued to finance flood prevention or protection projects. The bill authorizes localities to lend or grant money from the Fund to implement flood prevention and protection projects and studies, requiring that at least 25 percent of the money disbursed from the Fund each year be used for projects in low-income geographic areas. The measure also authorizes any locality to forgive the principal of a loan it grants in a low-income geographic area so long as the total amount of loans forgiven by all localities does not exceed 30 percent of the amount appropriated to the Fund during the fiscal year. The bill provides that any locality that forgives such a loan remains obligated to pay the principal to the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Community Flood Preparedness Fund; loan and grant program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption #2 (58-Y 34-N) (Y: 58 N: 33 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (75-Y 17-N) (Y: 75 N: 16 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1254)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1254 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled bill text (SB320ER2)
2020-04-22SenateReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: Adoption #2 (58-Y 34-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (58-Y 34-N)
2020-04-22HouseReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: Adoption (75-Y 17-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (75-Y 17-N)
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N)
2020-04-11SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB320ER)
2020-03-06SenateEnrolled
2020-03-02HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99--Y 0-N)
2020-03-02HouseRead third time
2020-02-28HouseRead second time
2020-02-26HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-02-24HouseRead first time
2020-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB320S2
2020-02-11SenateSubstitute by Senator Lewis agreed to 20108073D-S2
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateCommittee amendment rejected
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute rejected 20106966D-S1
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-11SenateFloor substitute printed 20108073D-S2 (Lewis)
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2020-01-28SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106966D-S1
2020-01-28SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-06SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103519D

Same As/Similar To

HB22 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1199)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101603.24(n/a)See Bill Text
101603.25(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB320&201+sum+SB320
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB320+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB320S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB320S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB320ES1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB320ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB320ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1254+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S01V0031+SB0320
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0246+SB0320
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB0320+SB0320
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0520SB0320+SB0320
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0521SB0320+SB0320
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0522SB0320+SB0320
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0523SB0320+SB0320
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H01V0254+SB0320
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1713+SB0320
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1954SB0320+SB0320
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2295+SB0320
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2272+SB0320

Bill Comments

feedback