VA HB22 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1199)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Community Flood Preparedness Fund; loan and grant program. Continues the Virginia Shoreline Resiliency Fund as the Virginia Community Flood Preparedness Fund, providing that the Fund shall include all sums that are deposited from revenue generated by the sale of emissions allowances and are designated to assist localities affected by recurrent flooding, sea level rise, and flooding from severe weather events. The bill directs the Virginia Resources Authority to manage the Fund and the Department of Conservation and Recreation to administer the Fund. The measure authorizes the Authority to manage the Fund in accordance with a memorandum of agreement with the Department and to pledge the assets of the Fund as security for any bonds issued to finance flood prevention or protection projects. The bill authorizes localities to lend or grant money from the Fund to implement flood prevention and protection projects and studies, requiring that at least 25 percent of the money disbursed from the Fund each year be used for projects in low-income geographic areas. The measure also authorizes any locality to forgive the principal of a loan it grants in a low-income geographic area so long as the total amount of loans forgiven by all localities does not exceed 30 percent of the amount appropriated to the Fund during the fiscal year. The bill provides that any locality that forgives such a loan remains obligated to pay the principal to the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Community Flood Preparedness Fund; loan and grant program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (64-Y 29-N) (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1199)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1199 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled bill text (HB22ER2)
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2020-04-22SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N)
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (64-Y 29-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (64-Y 29-N)
2020-04-22HousePassed by temporarily
2020-04-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-04-11HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-05SenateSigned by President
2020-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-04HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB22ER)
2020-03-04HouseEnrolled
2020-02-27SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2020-02-27SenateRead third time
2020-02-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-18SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB22H1
2020-02-10HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107999D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07HouseIncorporates HB751 (Jones)
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107999D-H1
2020-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2020-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-05HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
2019-11-19HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-11-19HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100479D

Same As/Similar To

HB751 (Similar To) 2020-02-07 - Incorporated by Appropriations
SB320 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1254)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101603.25(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB22&201+sum+HB22
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB22+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB22H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB22ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB22ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1199+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0102V0031+HB0022
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H01V0149+HB0022
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0201V0040+HB0022
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0214+HB0022
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0257+HB0022
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0901+HB0022
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S01V0079+HB0022
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0389+HB0022
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1050HB0022+HB0022
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1157HB0022+HB0022
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2007HB0022+HB0022
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2044HB0022+HB0022
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2045HB0022+HB0022
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2155+HB0022

Bill Comments

feedback