VA SB317 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB317

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Inpatient psychiatric services; in-home follow-up nursing services upon discharge. Directs the State Board of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to promulgate regulations that require each provider of inpatient psychiatric services to develop and implement a policy for linking individuals who will be discharged from inpatient psychiatric care with in-home follow-up nursing services as available, including assistance with medication management, upon discharge, which may be provided by a licensed home care organization, certified home health agency, community services board, or other appropriate service provider, allowing patient choice to the greatest extent possible in the selection of such service provider.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensed inpatient nursing services; in-home follow-up care upon discharge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25HouseContinued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2020-02-17HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-02-13HouseAssigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-02-03HouseRead first time
2020-02-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB317S1
2020-01-27SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106057D-S1
2020-01-27SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-27SenateRead second time
2020-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-23SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106057D-S1
2020-01-23SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2020-01-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-05SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103658D

Same As/Similar To

SB317 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321127(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback