VA SB316 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - VOTE: DEFEATED (52-Y 48-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - VOTE: DEFEATED (52-Y 48-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Conservation of trees; Town of Vienna. Allows the Town of Vienna, by ordinance, to require that a subdivision or development provide for the preservation or replacement of trees on the development site such that the minimum tree canopy 10 years after development is projected to meet specified coverage criteria. Under current law, the criteria apply to tree canopy coverage 20 years after development.
Title
Trees; Town of Vienna allowed to require subdivision/development provide for preservation, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: DEFEATED (52-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Defeated by House (52-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | (Requires 67 affirmative votes for passage) |
2024-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-23 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-19 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103882D |
Same As/Similar To
HB534 (Similar To) 2024-02-02 - Incorporated by Counties, Cities and Towns